Edwards, Dale Virginia (CPSO#: 23934)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
42 Camden Street #802
Toronto ON  M5V 1V1
Phone: (647) 293-0702
Fax: (647) 345-0718
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALE VIRGINIA EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1971