Edwards, Elizabeth Frances (CPSO#: 61799)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 1990

Summary

Former Name: Goldsmith, Elizabeth Frances (used until: 26 Feb 1991 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
383 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4R4
Phone: (613) 724-5852
Fax: (613) 724-9965
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Edwards ( CPSO# 61799 )

Business Address:
309 - 383 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4R4
Phone Number: (613) 724-5852

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH FRANCES EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jan 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1990