Edwards, Hollis Alexander (CPSO#: 21608)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1968
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2005
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 17 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 2006