Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Edwards, James Norman (CPSO#: 31611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Forensic Services and Coroners
Complex
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone: (647) 329-1823
Fax: (416) 314-4030
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES NORMAN EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1984