Edwards, Lori Marie (CPSO#: 86889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Laboratory Medicine and
Genetics Program
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100 Ext. 2140
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lori M. Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Edwards ( CPSO# 86889 )

Business Address:
Laboratory Medicine and Genetics Program
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORI MARIE EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2013