Edwards, Mark William (CPSO#: 52889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: 705-759-1234
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sault Area Hospitals
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C4
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. M. Mogharrabi ( CPSO# 57473 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. R. Gieni ( CPSO# 67230 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. S. Fratesi ( CPSO# 27368 )
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. E. Barrett ( CPSO# 56931 )
Dr. D. Beck ( CPSO# 50245 )
Dr. E. Beduhn ( CPSO# 26647 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. P. Bragaglia ( CPSO# 33769 )
Dr. D. Brooks ( CPSO# 26921 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. D. Burrows ( CPSO# 50233 )
Dr. P. Catania ( CPSO# 31907 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. R. Tull ( CPSO# 93890 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: Mark W. Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 253-1313

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK WILLIAM EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 1987