Edwards, Shawn Ross (CPSO#: 67860)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 1996


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 O'Loane Avenue
Stratford ON  N5A 6S6
Phone: (519) 273-1060
Fax: (519) 273-0371
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shawn Edwards Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2006

Dr. S. Edwards ( CPSO# 67860 )

Business Address:
700 O'Loane Avenue
Stratford ON  N5A 6S6
Phone Number: (519) 273-1060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. SHAWN ROSS EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1996