Edwards, Wendy Elizabeth (CPSO#: 66768)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
202 King Street West
Chatham ON  N7M 1E5
Phone: (519) 358-1880
Fax: (519) 358-1586
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: 519 322 2501
Fax: 519 322 0274
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wendy Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Edwards ( CPSO# 66768 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
202 King Street West
Chatham ON  N7M 1E5
Phone Number: (519) 358-1880

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1B7
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-2501

Business Address:
355 Lark Street
Chatham ON  N7L 5B2
Phone Number: (519) 354-0520

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY ELIZABETH EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1997