Edye, Frances Winnifred (CPSO#: 67095)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Edye-Mazowita, Frances Winnifred (used until: 19 Sep 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 30 Roslyn Crescent, Winnipeg, MB, R3L 0H7
Date Received: 19 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015