Eftekhari, Maryam (CPSO#: 81456)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 414
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 237-7723
Fax: (905) 291-0768
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Eftekhari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Eftekhari ( CPSO# 81456 )

Business Address:
Suite 414
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 237-7723

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARYAM EFTEKHARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EFTEKHARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006