Eftimescu, Dina Floriana (CPSO#: 58682)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008