Egan, Raymond Richard (CPSO#: 61239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
479 Tecumseh Avenue East
London ON  N6C 1T6
Phone: (519) 679 3494
Fax: (519) 679 6090
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

800 Commissioners Rd E.
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: 5196858500 Ext. 76671
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

871 Trafalgar St
London ON  N5Z 1E6
Canada
Phone: 519 433 3101 Ext. 141
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND RICHARD EGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1989