Egan, Thomas Michael (CPSO#: 31543)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Oct 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Oct 1989