Ege, Hatice Gunes Nurettin (CPSO#: 22537)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Turkish

Education:Harvard Medical School, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Radiation Oncology Effective: 18 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005