Egerdie, Russell Blair (CPSO#: 52842)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Urology Associates
Unit 18
450 Westheights Drive
Kitchener ON  N2N 2B9
Phone: (519) 578-1282
Fax: (519) 578-1362
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Egerdie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Egerdie ( CPSO# 52842 )

Business Address:
Urology Associates
Unit 18
450 Westheights Drive
Kitchener ON  N2N 2B9
Phone Number: (519) 578-1294

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUSSELL BLAIR EGERDIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EGERDIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 31 Dec 1986
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1987 to 30 Jun 1987
Research Fellows - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1984