Egger, Gian (CPSO#: 50476)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Geneva, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare Services
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: (905) 815-5082
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIAN EGGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EGGER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1988