Egier, Brian Philip (CPSO#: 32865)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian P. Egier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 31 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2013