Egles, Diane Elizabeth (CPSO#: 32544)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 Oct 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Albert Street S
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Phone: (226) 435-3006
Fax: (226) 435-3008
Electoral District: 03

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jan 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2014
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 07 May 2015
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 07 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 09 Jun 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 09 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 31, 2014, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Diane Elizabeth
            Egles, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Egles to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  I, Dr. Egles, agree that I shall restrict my practice to outpatients
                  only, with a maximum of 800 rostered patients, and I will not spend more
                  than 20 hours per week involved in patient care.
                  
                  
            As from June 9, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Diane Elizabeth
            Egles, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Egles to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                       DR. DIANE ELIZABETH EGLES
                                             ("Dr. Egles")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Egles, certificate of registration number 32544, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Egles, acknowledge that I am currently the subject of a College
                  investigation bearing File Number 7214621 (the "Investigation") into
                  allegations that I have failed to maintain the standard of practice
                  and/or have displayed incompetence in my care and treatment of patients. 

            (4)   I, Dr. Egles, acknowledge that, upon receiving an original copy of this
                  Undertaking as signed by me, the College has agreed to take no further
                  action on the Investigation.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Egles, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it.

            (6)   Clinical Supervision 
                  (a)   I, Dr. Egles, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Egles, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B" to this Undertaking;
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least ten (10) of my patient charts once every two
                              (2) weeks for at least six (6) weeks;
                  
                        (iii) Observe me in my practice for  1/2 day every two (2) weeks
                              (this will comprise at least two (2) patient encounters) for
                              a period of at least three (3) months;
                  
                        (iv)  If, after the six (6) week period referred to in  (ii) above,
                              my Supervisor suggests, and the College agrees, that my
                              Supervision can be reduced to monthly chart reviews, my
                              Supervision shall be so reduced for the remainder of my
                              twelve (12) month supervision; 
                  
                        (v)   If, after the three (3) month period referred to in  (iii)
                              above, my Supervisor suggests, and the College agrees, that
                              my Supervision can be reduced to monthly observation, my
                              Supervision shall be so reduced for the remainder of my
                              twelve (12) month supervision;
                  
                        (vi)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews and/or
                              observation;
                  
                        (vii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (viii)Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (ix)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month for the first three (3) months and once every three (3)
                              months thereafter, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice. The
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) may submit an additional report after
                              the six (6) week period referred to in (ii) above if s/he
                              suggests that my Clinical Supervision can be reduced to
                              monthly chart reviews.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Egles, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my
                        Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report(s) of the medical inspector dated October 2, 2015, and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Egles, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Egles, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Egles, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Egles, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Egles, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Egles, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in: 
                  
                              1.    medical record keeping; and
                  
                              2.    continuing professional development with a recognized
                                    educational tracking program through the Royal College
                                    of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of
                                    Family Physicians of Canada or the General Practice
                                    Psychotherapy Association;
                  
                        (ii)  all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B"; and
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Egles, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (7)(a) within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Egles, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        professional education set out in section (7)(a).
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Egles, undertake to complete this requirement by the first
                        possible opportunity.
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Egles, undertake that, approximately twelve (12) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (6) above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a
                        Reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may include a chart
                        review, direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues
                        and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Egles, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Egles, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Egles, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Egles, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (8)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Egles, hereby consent to any of the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (8)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Egles, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Egles, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Egles, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010, and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Egles, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP: and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Egles, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Egles, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Egles, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Egles, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Egles, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (15)  I, Dr. Egles, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Egles was the subject of a College investigation into whether
                        she failed to maintain the standard of practice or displayed
                        incompetence in her care and treatment of patients. As a result of
                        the investigation:
                  
                        *     Dr. Egles will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months. 
                        *     Dr. Egles will engage in professional education in medical
                              record-keeping, as well as regularly required Continuing
                              Professional Development.
                        *     Dr. Egles' practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College approximately 12 months after the end
                              of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Egles, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (7) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Egles, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any
                  information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering
                  into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Egles, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in section (7) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (7) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Apr 2015
Summary:

 On April 7, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Egles committed an act of professional 
 misconduct in that she has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Egles admitted to the allegation.

Dr. Egles 
 entered into a contract with the Physician Health Program (“PHP Contract”) dated January 8, 2009, 
 which was amended several times between February 2009 and November 2011. 

In about August 2011, 
 in breach of her PHP Contract, Dr. Egles wrote a prescription to herself in a colleague’s name and 
 worked at a nursing home when her PHP contract prohibited her from working. The PHP reported these 
 breaches to the College, which led to Dr. Egles entering into an Undertaking with the College on 
 April 16, 2012 whereby she agreed that if she failed to comply with her PHP Contract “…such action 
 may constitute a breach of this undertaking, and an act of professional misconduct.”  

On April 
 18, 2013, the College received a letter from the PHP reporting that Dr. Egles was in breach of her 
 PHP Contract. 

On October 31, 2014, Dr. Egles entered into a health monitoring undertaking 
 directly with the College which includes restrictions on her hours of work and patient load.  
 

The Committee ordered and directed that:
- the Registrar suspend Dr. Egles’ certificate of 
 registration for a two month period effective May 7, 2015.
- Dr. Egles appear before the panel to 
 be reprimanded.
- Dr. Egles pay costs to the College in the amount of $4,460.00, within 30 days of 
 the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 7, 2015

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 9, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Diane Elizabeth Egles to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 9, 2016:

Dr. Egles was the subject of a College investigation into whether she failed to maintain the standard of practice or displayed incompetence in her care and treatment of patients. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Egles will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.
• Dr. Egles will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping, as well as regularly required Continuing Professional Development.
• Dr. Egles’ practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately 12 months after the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: Member
Active Date: May 10, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:

Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that Diane Egles on or about January 27, 2016, at the City of Brampton, while her ability to operate a motor vehicle was impaired by a drug, did operate a motor vehicle, contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code.

Date of charge: February 25, 2016
Place of charge: Brampton, Ontario
Ontario Provincial Police Port Credit