Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Ehlen, Thomas Gereon (CPSO#: 61602)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Apr 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Apr 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Johannes Gutenberg University at Mainz, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 May 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Apr 2006