Ehrat, Caroline Bettina (CPSO#: 67832)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Medical
Protection Association
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone: (613) 725-2000
Fax: (613) 725-1300
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caroline Ehrat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ehrat ( CPSO# 67832 )

Business Address:
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone Number: (613) 725-2000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE BETTINA EHRAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EHRAT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996