Ehrlich, Lisa Ellyn (CPSO#: 45428)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4360
Fax: (416) 480-5855
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA ELLYN EHRLICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EHRLICH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1986