Ehrlich, Peter Frederick (CPSO#: 61171)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1540 East Hospital Drive
SPC 4211
C S Mott Childrens Hospital
4-945
Ann Arbor MI  48109
United States
Phone: (734) 763-2072
Fax: (734) 232-8667

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan
USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER FREDERICK EHRLICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EHRLICH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1990