Eichhofer, Jonas (CPSO#: 85960)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Rhenish Frederick William Univ of Bonn, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2007 to 25 Apr 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 26 Apr 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2008