Eickmeier, Daniel James (CPSO#: 77543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Huron Community Family Health Team
P O Box 460
32 B 1 Centennial Drive
Seaforth ON  N0K 1W0
Phone: (519) 600-2273
Fax: (519) 600-2501
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

373 Turnberry Street
Brussels ON  N0G 1H0
Canada
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL JAMES EICKMEIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EICKMEIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004