Eidlitz, Carey Jeffrey (CPSO#: 56754)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone: (905) 336-4135
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carey Eidlitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Eidlitz ( CPSO# 56754 )

Business Address:
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 336-4135

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAREY JEFFREY EIDLITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EIDLITZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jun 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1988