Eidus, Leslie Bence (CPSO#: 30323)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Juravinski Hospital 711 Concession Street Hamilton, ON L8V 1C3
Instructions: Records located at Juravinski Hospital
Date Received: 14 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Apr 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014