Eiriksson, Lua Ruhiyyih (CPSO#: 89877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 389-5688
Fax: (905) 575-6343
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lua Eiriksson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Eiriksson ( CPSO# 89877 )

Business Address:
St Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 777-3837

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 389-5688

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6


Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Engels Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Engels ( CPSO# 92753 )
Dr. L. Eiriksson ( CPSO# 89877 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
6 North Wing
Room 617
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
3rd Floor, McMaster Wing
Room 350
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUA RUHIYYIH EIRIKSSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EIRIKSSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2008 to 19 Oct 2008
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2009 to 08 Feb 2009
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2010