Eisen, Ari Brent (CPSO#: 56755)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6010
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. B. Eisen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Eisen ( CPSO# 56755 )

Business Address:
3rd Floor
10 Angeline Street North, East Wing
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 328-6171

Business Address:
304 - 4002 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 1S6
Phone Number: (416) 299-9895

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care Centre
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6010

Business Address:
Toronto Western Cardiac and
Medical Imaging Center
100 - 4250 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M9L 1W9
Phone Number: (416) 740-3184


Corporation Name: T.M. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 5 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARI BRENT EISEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EISEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1987