Eisen, David William (CPSO#: 62403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 501
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 223-0555
Fax: (416) 223-0540
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David W. Eisen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Eisen ( CPSO# 62403 )

Business Address:
Suite 501
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 223-0555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID WILLIAM EISEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EISEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1991