Eisen, Doron Abraham (CPSO#: 59629)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Building E
Suite 200B
1105 Kingston Rd
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone: (905) 420-9999
Fax: (905) 420-1090
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doron Eisen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Eisen ( CPSO# 59629 )

Business Address:
College of Physicians and Surgeons
80 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2E2
Phone Number: (905) 420-9999

Business Address:
200B - 1105 Kingston Road, Building E
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 420-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DORON ABRAHAM EISEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EISEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1989