Eisen, Leonard Bruce (CPSO#: 55472)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Mount Sinai Hospital 600 University Avenue Toronto, ON M5G 1X5
Date Received: 25 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016