Eisen, Steven Martin (CPSO#: 59076)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Nov 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Apr 2004