Eisenberg, Morty (CPSO#: 28283)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1976

Summary

Former Name: Eisenberg, Morton (used until: 26 Sep 1982 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Phone: (905) 881-3984
Fax: (905) 881-3198
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
St. John's Rehab
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2G1
Canada
Phone: (416) 226-6780 Ext. 7141
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Morty Eisenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Eisenberg ( CPSO# 28283 )

Business Address:
1 - 390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 881-3984

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MORTY EISENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EISENBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1976