Eisener-Parsche, Pamela Doris (CPSO#: 62180)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Medical Protective Associa
875 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone: (613) 725-2000
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
Bruyere Continuing Care
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Canada
Phone: 613-562-6262
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA DORIS EISENER-PARSCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EISENER-PARSCHE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1991