Eisner, Rhonda Bea (CPSO#: 29258)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: Lichtenberg, Rhonda Bea (used until: 15 Dec 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone: (416) 291-7719 Ext. 153
Fax: (416) 287-3775
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rhonda Eisner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Eisner ( CPSO# 29258 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Toronto ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RHONDA BEA EISNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EISNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1977