Ekstrand, Gayle Patricia (CPSO#: 58354)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1988


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Medical Centre
Suite 300
5307 Canotek Road
Gloucester ON  K1J 9M2
Phone: (613) 746-6223
Fax: (613) 746-6018
Electoral District: 07


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. GAYLE PATRICIA EKSTRAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EKSTRAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1988