El Abbassi, Wael Nabil (CPSO#: 80244)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Univerzita Komenskeho,Martin, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 14 Oct 2003 to 11 Nov 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 12 Nov 2003 to 13 Oct 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004