El Emary, Mohamed Adel Mahmoud (CPSO#: 90325)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2009 to 23 Jun 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 07 May 2010
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 2010