El Fitori, Adel K (CPSO#: 76640)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lorraine Wing
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone: (613) 732-3675 Ext. 6702
Fax: (613) 732-6347
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

647 FAIRVIEW AVE
Pembroke ON  K8A 8N4
Canada
Phone: (613) 401-7995
Fax: (613) 732-6347
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El Fitori Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. El Fitori ( CPSO# 76640 )

Business Address:
Lorraine Wing
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone Number: (613) 732-3675

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADEL K EL FITORI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL FITORI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2007