El Ganga, Fouad Mehemmed (CPSO#: 87416)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Zagreb, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 27 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 28 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 12 May 2010
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015