El Harram, Mohamed Ahmed (CPSO#: 55181)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Mar 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Italian

Education:Garyounis University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone: (705) 876-4506
Fax: (705) 743-6278
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 204
86 Angeline Street South
Lindsay ON  L9V 6C5
Canada
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Elharram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. El Harram ( CPSO# 55181 )

Business Address:
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 15 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED AHMED EL HARRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL HARRAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993