El Khouly, Nihal Abdel Ghany El Said (CPSO#: 81880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
170 McEwan Drive East
Bolton ON  L7E 4C8
Phone: (905) 857-3474
Fax: (905) 951-7856
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. El Khouly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. El Khouly ( CPSO# 81880 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
170 McEwan Drive
Bolton ON  L7E 4C8
Phone Number: (905) 857-3474

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jan 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIHAL ABDEL GHANY EL SAID EL KHOULY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL KHOULY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2004 to 07 Dec 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Dec 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2007