El Masri, William Samuel Aziz (CPSO#: 50503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: El Masri, William Samuel (used until: 05 Jun 1983 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Armenian, English, French, Italian

Education:University of Alexandria, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone: (416) 406-6540
Fax: (416) 406-6541
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 340
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 406-6540
Fax: (416) 966-9288
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

890 Yonge street
Toronto ON  M4W 3P4
Canada
Phone: 416 9624444
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

5400 Young Street
Toronto ON  M2N 5R5
Canada
Phone: (416) 221-5554
Fax: (416) 221-8321
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William El Masri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. El Masri ( CPSO# 50503 )

Business Address:
304 - 658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone Number: (416) 406-6540

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 06 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM SAMUEL AZIZ EL MASRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL MASRI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1983