El Sayed, Manal Faissal (CPSO#: 83169)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Lebanese University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 8
260 Lakeshore Road
St Catharines ON  L2M 7R4
Phone: 905-937-4154
Fax: 905-934-3187
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manal El Sayed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. El Sayed ( CPSO# 83169 )

Business Address:
8 - 260 Lakeshore Road
St Catharines ON  L2M 7R4
Phone Number: (905) 937-4154

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANAL FAISSAL EL SAYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL SAYED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 14 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013