El Tawil, Basel Aref (CPSO#: 83439)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leamington District Mem Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
3rd Floor
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 322-4755
Fax: (519) 322-5965
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. EL Tawil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. El Tawil ( CPSO# 83439 )

Business Address:
Leamington District Mem Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
194 Talbot Street West
3rd Floor
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-4755

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BASEL AREF EL TAWIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL TAWIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 25 Aug 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2008