El Zuway, Rabeh Mjihed Ali (CPSO#: 86092)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Garyounis University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster University
Faculty of Health Sciences
Juravinsky Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 43893
Fax: (905) 381-7032
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. El Zuway Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. El Zuway ( CPSO# 86092 )

Business Address:
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RABEH MJIHED ALI EL ZUWAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL ZUWAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 22 May 2007 to 20 Jul 2007
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 21 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Jul 2008 to 23 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Jul 2009 to 23 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Jul 2010 to 23 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2011