El Zuway, Salem A Ali (CPSO#: 85553)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Garyounis University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street, 3 Bond Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Salem El Zuway Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 5 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 05 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALEM A ALI EL ZUWAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL ZUWAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Sep 2006 to 03 Nov 2006
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 04 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 05 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 06 Nov 2007 to 05 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 06 Nov 2008 to 05 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 06 Nov 2009 to 05 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 06 Nov 2010 to 05 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 06 Nov 2011 to 05 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 06 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2012