El-Ashry, Dalia (CPSO#: 70493)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 220
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 275-1133
Fax: (905) 275-4535
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 220
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L8B 2V2
Canada
Phone: (905) 275-1133
Fax: (905) 275-4535
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. El-Ashry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. El-Ashry ( CPSO# 70493 )

Business Address:
Suite 220
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 275-1133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 17 Nov 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALIA EL-ASHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-ASHRY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2001