El-Beheiry, Hossam El-Din Mohamed Ahmed (CPSO#: 64554)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7628
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 queensway west
Mississauga ON  L5B1B8
Canada
Phone: 905-848-7628
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El-Beheiry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. El-Beheiry ( CPSO# 64554 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 272-2600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOSSAM EL-DIN MOHAMED AHMED EL-BEHEIRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-BEHEIRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1995