ElBohy, Manar Mouneer Eysa (CPSO#: 91245)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Desouky El-Bohy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Desouky ( CPSO# 99844 )
Dr. M. ElBohy ( CPSO# 91245 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANAR MOUNEER EYSA ELBOHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELBOHY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2015